Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6723 |
20/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37023 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2886/D602 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
20/07/1961 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/2007 |
Time in Service |
46 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
20/07/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
12/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
12/1982 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6723 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2886 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37023 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
05/06/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
31/12/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37023 |
|
|