Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 198 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18001 Week
» 71017 Month
» 190544 Year
» 3217397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6721 |
06/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37021 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37715 |
17/11/1988 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
06/07/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
10/07/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/07/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6721 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2884 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37021 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
04/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
10/07/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
17/11/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37715 |
|
|
01/06/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37715 |
|
|
11/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|