Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 287 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 9231 Week
» 287 Month
» 346711 Year
» 3373564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6712 |
m/e |
06/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
279 |
Works Number |
2393 |
To Service |
During 06/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 18/07/1960 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1959 |
Swansea Paxton St. MPD (Gurnos) |
The former LNW M.P.D. (Paxton St.) was closed w.e.f. 31st August; freight diagrams and 8F 2-8-0s have been transferred to Llanelly whilst passenger turns and the Fowler 2-6-4Ts transferred to Landore-the remaining shunting turns have been transferred to East Dock, which has taken over Upper Bank and Gurnos, the two ex-M.R. sheds. The present allocation at Upper Bank is 6700/2/14/38/63/6/7/8/73/4/8 and at Gurnos 6712/20/49/70/7. Llandovery is now sub to Llanelly. |
SLS/195910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6712 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2393 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
31/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
18/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6712 |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|