Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3245 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17288 Week
» 82242 Month
» 284906 Year
» 3311759 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6712 |
10/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37012 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
10/03/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
31/03/2003 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs , 21 dys |
Cut Up |
08/2003 |
Cut At |
Sims Metals (Beeston) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
10/03/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/07/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/07/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6712 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
05/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
04/07/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
14/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37012 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
31/03/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37012 |
|
|
08/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Sims Metals: Beeston |
|
|