Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3996 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17402 Week
» 70418 Month
» 189945 Year
» 3216798 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6710 |
24/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37010 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
24/02/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
30/06/2005 |
Time in Service |
44 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
26/07/2007 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
24/02/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
30/11/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
30/11/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6710 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
10/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37010 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
30/11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37010 |
|
|
26/07/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|