Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 551 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18354 Week
» 71370 Month
» 190897 Year
» 3217750 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6708 |
10/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37008 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37352 |
17/06/1988 |
|
TOPS (37/0 (R)) |
37008 |
06/07/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
10/02/1961 to Ipswich (32B) |
Withdrawn |
24/02/1992 |
Time in Service |
31 yrs , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
07/1996 |
Cut At |
MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
10/02/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
27/11/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
27/11/1976 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6708 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37008 |
|
|
27/11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
17/06/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37352 |
|
|
06/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37008 |
|
|
24/02/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37008 |
|
|
07/1996 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|