Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1420 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15463 Week
» 80417 Month
» 283081 Year
» 3309934 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6704 |
m/e |
03/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
279 |
Works Number |
2385 |
To Service |
During 03/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/03/1958 |
Service Life |
28 yrs , 10 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1930 |
CED |
|
Cardiff East Dock |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88A |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/03/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6704 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2385 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
10/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6704 |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|