Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 620 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6404 Week
» 27793 Month
» 147320 Year
» 3174173 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6703 |
28/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37003 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
28/12/1960 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
21/01/2000 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs , 24 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
28/12/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/12/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
vot |
Vacuum brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6703 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
20/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37003 |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
21/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37003 |
|
|