Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18095 Week
» 71111 Month
» 190638 Year
» 3217491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6693 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/01/1963 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6693 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
31/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
14/01/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6693 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|