Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 408 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14451 Week
» 79405 Month
» 282069 Year
» 3308922 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6687 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/05/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1928 |
PPRD |
|
Pontypool Road |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
86J |
|
Aberdare |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/05/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86J |
Aberdare |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/05/1962 |
South Wales |
5636/9/82 an 6687 withdrawn 19th May were noted as follows-on 20th May, 5682 was at rear of Abercynon shed marked 'not to be moved' and 5636/9 and 6687 were noted at Radyr waiting CME's decision. By 15th June, Canton's original Kings had dwindled to two-6010/28; (6003/4/24 are in store and 6023 stopped for factory while 6018/9 have been transferred to 81A). The 8-55 a.m. and 7-20 p.m. Cardiff-Salop are usually King-hauled. All Canton's Castles are regularly employed. |
SLS/196207 |
31/05/1962 |
First G.W.R. Collett 5600 Class condemned |
The first inroads were made to the Collett 5600 Class 0-6-2T locos. when 5636 of Merthyr (88D), 5639 of Barry (88C), 5682 of Abercynon (88E) and 6687 of Aberdare (88J) were withdrawn from service during May. |
SLS/196207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6687 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (86J) |
|
|
21/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6687 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|