Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 508 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18311 Week
» 71327 Month
» 190854 Year
» 3217707 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6682 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 14/02/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1928 |
OXF |
|
Oxford |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/02/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
21/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
24/02/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6682 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
14/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6682 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|