|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/04/1948 | Barry Works | On 2/4 the following were observed in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 344, 3707/14/75, 5608/19/60, 6669, 6754 an 9789, while out-side were:-Nos. 414, 1993, 5630, 6680, 6700 an 8748. | SLS/194805 |
26/04/1964 | Swindon Works (Dump) | Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1928 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 6680 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
09/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Radyr (88B) | ||
08/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6680 | ||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |