Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1465 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19268 Week
» 72284 Month
» 191811 Year
» 3218664 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6670 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 09/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/10/1963 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
4w/e |
28/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
85A |
Worcester |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
ALLOC |
88G |
Llantrisant |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
5w/e |
02/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6670 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (88G) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
03/10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6670 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|