Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3872 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22783 Week
» 87737 Month
» 290401 Year
» 3317254 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6659 |
m/e |
08/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 08/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/10/1963 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6659 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cae Harris (Dowlais) (CH) |
|
|
14/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
21/10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6659 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|