Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6651 |
m/e |
08/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 08/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/10/1965 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6651 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (TDU) |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
15/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6651 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|