Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 607 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6391 Week
» 27780 Month
» 147307 Year
» 3174160 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6607 |
22/10/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37307 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37403 |
28/06/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 22/10/1965 | 37/4 | 28/06/1985 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
22/10/1965 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/2000 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
22/10/1965 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/08/1969 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/10/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/08/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 06/1980 |
xbt |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6607 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37307 |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
28/06/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37403 |
|
|
01/03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37403 |
|
|