Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1360 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19163 Week
» 72179 Month
» 191706 Year
» 3218559 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6600 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
244 |
To Service |
During 08/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/08/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/06/1959 |
Tredegar MPD |
The Barry Island Sunday excursions, for so long worked by ex-L.N.W. 0-8-0s from this shed are now worked by 66XX tanks. On shed at Tredegar, 21st June were-3700 (86K), 5727, 5768 (86B), 6439 (86A), 6600, 9662, 40098 (86K), 40161 (stored), 40171 (86K), 41201/4. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6600 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (86D) |
|
|
24/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6600 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|