Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1798 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15204 Week
» 68220 Month
» 187747 Year
» 3214600 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6593 |
23/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33208 |
12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
23/03/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/1970 |
|
Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/03/1962 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 05/1970 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6593 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
22/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (73D) |
|
|
20/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33208 |
|
|
01/02/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33208 |
|
|