Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 894 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14300 Week
» 67316 Month
» 186843 Year
» 3213696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6577 |
18/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33058 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
18/11/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/11/1961 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6577 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
17/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
12/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33058 |
|
|
21/06/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33058 |
|
|
17/06/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|