Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17886 Week
» 70902 Month
» 190429 Year
» 3217282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6555 |
20/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33037 |
12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
20/05/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/05/1961 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6555 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
01/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33037 |
|
|
23/09/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33037 from Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
08/08/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|