Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 620 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1747 Week
» 13040 Month
» 277673 Year
» 1499238 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6517 22/07/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 33105 12/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
33/022/07/1960
33/105/1967
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 22/07/1960 to Hither Green (73C)
Withdrawn 27/10/1987
Time in Service 27 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 06/11/1990
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) on 22/07/1960
34E New England w/e 16/12/1961
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 07/03/1966
   Withdrawn on 27/10/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
05/1967   Push and Pull Fitted      


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/07/1960 To Service To service as D6517
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
16/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
07/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
05/1967 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 33105    
27/10/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 33105    
06/11/1990 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev