Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 168 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2313 Week
» 16570 Month
» 244454 Year
» 1466019 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6516 15/07/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 33104 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
33/015/07/1960
33/105/1967
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 15/07/1960
Withdrawn 16/12/1985
Time in Service 25 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 31/03/1986
Cut At British Rail (at Slade Green MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 15/07/1960
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 04/04/1966
   Withdrawn 16/12/1985

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
05/1967   Push and Pull Fitted      

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
14/04/1964 Not severe   Electrical overloads or arcs Electrical insulation    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/07/1960 To Service To service as D6516
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
04/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
05/1967 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33104    
16/12/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 33104    
31/03/1986 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at Slade Green MPD    

prev prev