Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 161 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17964 Week
» 70980 Month
» 190507 Year
» 3217360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6511 |
04/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33101 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
04/06/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1967 |
|
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/06/1960 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
06/1967 |
xep |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Push Pull fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6511 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
07/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33101 |
|
|
24/05/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33101 |
|
|
25/02/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Eastleigh MPD |
|
|