Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4297 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17703 Week
» 70719 Month
» 190246 Year
» 3217099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6438 |
on |
22/04/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
64xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
305 |
To Service |
Tue 22/04/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/11/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
AYN |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
09/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
4w/e |
31/12/1960 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
25/03/1961 |
ALLOC |
88H |
Tondu |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
19/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1961 |
Bewdley-Tenbury-Woofferton |
The T.U.C.C. has approved the closure of the Tenbury-Woofferton section but is to suggest to the Central T.U.C.C. that a morning train be run from Tenbury-Kidderminster (and a return evening service). During February, the Tenbury auto, for so long worked by a 14XX engine, was taken over by 6438. |
SLS/196104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/04/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6438 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (86C) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
13/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6438 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|