Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 888 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18691 Week
» 71707 Month
» 191234 Year
» 3218087 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6434 |
on |
12/03/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
64xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
305 |
To Service |
Sat 12/03/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/09/1964 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/03/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6434 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Merthyr Tydfil (MTHR) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (MTHR) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
06/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C) |
|
|
05/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6434 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston |
|
|