Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2046 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19849 Week
» 72865 Month
» 192392 Year
» 3219245 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6429 |
on |
18/11/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
64xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
300 |
To Service |
Thu 18/11/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 15/03/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
84C |
Banbury |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
84H |
Wellington |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/11/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6429 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellington (84H) |
|
|
15/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6429 |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|