Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15304 Week
» 68320 Month
» 187847 Year
» 3214700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6421 |
on |
29/08/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
64xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
294 |
To Service |
Mon 29/08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/01/1963 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
29/08/1935 |
LA |
|
Laira |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
84C |
|
Banbury |
4w/e |
16/07/1960 |
84H |
|
Wellington |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
83D |
|
Laira |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/01/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84C |
Banbury |
4w/e |
16/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
84H |
Wellington |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/11/1946 |
Exeter MPD |
On 16/11, the following were observed on Exeter shed: 3018, 3395, 3451, 4954, 5051, 5321, 6421, 6957 and 6963; whilst L.M.S. 8.F 8409 and 8421 were on passing freight trains. 1449 and 1468 were working the Heathfield branch and 3335 and 6385 were station pilots. The 11.25 a.m. (G.W.) stopping train to Plymouth was worked by S.R. 21C118 |
SLS/194701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6421 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Laira (LA) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellington (84H) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
07/01/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6421 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|