Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4388 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17794 Week
» 70810 Month
» 190337 Year
» 3217190 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6413 |
on |
13/11/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
64xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
294 |
To Service |
Tue 13/11/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 14/11/1961 |
Service Life |
27 yrs , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
14D |
Neasden |
8w/e |
05/09/1959 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
EXLOAN |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/11/1934 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6413 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
14/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6413 |
|
|
12/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|