Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1191 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18994 Week
» 72010 Month
» 191537 Year
» 3218390 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6411 |
on |
09/11/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
64xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
294 |
To Service |
Thu 09/11/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 02/03/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
09/11/1934 |
CV.AYN |
|
Abercynon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88A |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/03/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/03/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/03/1961 |
Caerphilly Works (Being cut-up) |
Erecting Shops: 1424, 1504, 2247, 4250, 4611, 5202/5/16/21/49, 5569, 6340/78, 6764, 6849, 7307, 8795, 9401/90, 9796. Awaiting Works: 3617/93, 4232. Being cut-up: 3778, 7422, 6411. |
SLS/196105 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/11/1934 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6411 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
02/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6411 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|