Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 824 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31474 Week
» 130119 Month
» 332783 Year
» 3359636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6141 |
15/03/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
15/03/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/09/1960 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
17/06/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
01/05/1961 |
20/05/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
20 days |
|
27,353 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
28/02/1962 |
31/03/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
32 days |
|
72,389 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
19/08/1962 |
27/08/1962 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
9 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
19/06/1963 |
19/07/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
31 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
27/08/1964 |
02/09/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
7 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
07/06/1965 |
10/07/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
34 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
22/09/1966 |
29/10/1966 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
38 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6141 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27945 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
01/05/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/05/1961. Dep: 20/05/1961. |
|
|
28/02/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/02/1962. Dep: 31/03/1962. |
|
|
19/08/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 19/08/1962. Dep: 27/08/1962. |
|
|
19/06/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1963. Dep: 19/07/1963. |
|
|
27/08/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/08/1964. Dep: 02/09/1964. |
|
|
07/06/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/06/1965. Dep: 10/07/1965. |
|
|
22/09/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1966. Dep: 29/10/1966. |
|
|
24/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6141 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|