Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4080 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13654 Week
» 78608 Month
» 281272 Year
» 3308125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6126 |
06/10/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
06/10/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/10/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
21/11/1961 |
22/11/1961 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
48,295 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
14/03/1962 |
31/03/1962 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
18 days |
|
72,700 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
09/02/1967 |
11/02/1967 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6126 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27856 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/11/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 21/11/1961. Dep: 22/11/1961. |
|
|
14/03/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1962. Dep: 31/03/1962. |
|
|
09/02/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1967. Dep: 11/02/1967. |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6126 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
02/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|