Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 455 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18258 Week
» 71274 Month
» 190801 Year
» 3217654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6123 |
m/e |
10/1931 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
61xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
269 |
To Service |
During 10/1931 |
Building Cost |
£4,160.00 (including £847 for the boiler) |
Withdrawal |
Thu 05/04/1962 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
Total Mileage |
980,193 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81D |
Reading (W.R.) |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
ALLOC |
81B |
Slough |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
ALLOC |
81F |
Oxford |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1950 |
Chessington Zoo excursions |
On 23rd and 30th August, 1950, through excursions were run from Maidenhead and/or High Wycombe to Chessington South, for the Zoo. Passengers were, of course, mostly juveniles. The route was via the West London Line, Clapham Jc., East Putney, Wimbledon and Motspur Park. The second of these was hauled to Kensington by 2-6-2T No. 6123, and thence by U.2-6-0 No. 31625. The load was nine coaches of W.R. stock, with more than half the seats occupied despite the mid-week date. Considerable amazement was caused by the passage of this train down the purely suburban electrified Chessington branch. |
SLS/195101 |
31/08/1950 |
Ramblers Excursions |
Several Sunday Special Ramblers' Excursions were run by the W.R. from Paddington last summer to Henley-on-Thames, Marlow, and Princes Risborough (where a special trip down the Watlington branch was made by the branch engine and single coach). One of the trips to Henley was a 12-coach train hauled by 2-6-0 No. 6360, which was unable to keep time with this heavy load. On an excursion to Marlow, 2-6-2T No. 6123 did much better with 9 coaches of 'Cornish Riviera' stock. The train-very crowded-had to be limited to nine coaches because of the reversal necessary at Bourne End, where the passing loop (used to run the engine round) would not allow a longer train. Ordinarily, the Bourne End-Marlow branch sees nothing more exciting than a single-coach train drawn by a 14xx 0-4-2T. The Princes Risborough train of ten coaches, hauled by 2-6-2T No. 6128, called at Ealing Broadway (as did the others) and thence got to the High Wycombe line via the West Ealing-Greenford loop. The load and gradients seemed too much for this engine to keep time on the down journey. |
SLS/195101 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6123 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Slough (SLO) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
05/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6123 |
|
|
11/08/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|