Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 277 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6061 Week
» 27450 Month
» 146977 Year
» 3173830 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D61 |
08/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45112 |
31/08/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
08/03/1962 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
07/05/1987 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
05/02/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
21/02/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
12/06/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D61 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
06/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Naming |
Named 'ROYAL ARMY ORDNANCE CORPS' |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
08/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
31/08/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45112 |
|
|
07/05/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45112 |
|
|