Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4004 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17410 Week
» 70426 Month
» 189953 Year
» 3216806 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E6041 |
19/09/1966 |
TOPS (Tops) |
73134 |
01/01/1973 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
19/10/1985 |
Woking Homes 1885-1985 |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/09/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E6041 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 73134 |
|
|
04/08/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Ramsgate (RE) |
|
|
19/10/1985 |
Naming |
Named 'Woking Homes 1885-1985' by Mrs P Bohling, Mayoress of Woking at Waterloo station |
|
|