|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 08/05/1959 | n/a | 12/05/1959 | 29/05/1959 | Unclassified | 18 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 17/10/1960 | 507 days | 18/10/1960 | 05/01/1961 | Light Casual | 80 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 19/01/1961 | 14 days | 19/01/1961 | 14/04/1961 | Light Casual | 86 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 07/06/1961 | 54 days | 27/06/1961 | 24/08/1961 | Light Casual | 59 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 11/09/1961 | 18 days | 15/09/1961 | 18/10/1961 | Light Casual | 34 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 21/10/1961 | 3 days | 21/10/1961 | 23/10/1961 | Light Casual | 3 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 18/01/1962 | 87 days | 29/01/1962 | 27/02/1962 | Light Casual | 30 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 02/05/1962 | 64 days | 08/05/1962 | 06/06/1962 | Light Casual | 30 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 13/09/1962 | 99 days | 17/09/1962 | 02/10/1962 | Heavy Casual | 16 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 07/11/1962 | 36 days | 14/11/1962 | 22/11/1962 | Unclassified | 9 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 02/04/1963 | 131 days | 02/04/1963 | 06/04/1963 | Light Casual | 5 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 09/07/1964 | 460 days | 09/07/1964 | 16/07/1964 | Unknown Regime Component change |
8 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 04/09/1966 | 780 days | 18/11/1966 | Unknown Regime Seen in ‘A’ shop |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/01/1959 | To Service | To service as British Railways number D604, name: COSSACK Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27664 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
||
12/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1959. Dep: 29/05/1959. Stopped on 08/05/1959 |
||
18/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1960. Dep: 05/01/1961. Stopped on 17/10/1960 |
||
19/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1961. Dep: 14/04/1961. Stopped on 19/01/1961 |
||
27/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/06/1961. Dep: 24/08/1961. Stopped on 07/06/1961 |
||
15/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1961. Dep: 18/10/1961. Stopped on 11/09/1961 |
||
21/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1961. Dep: 23/10/1961. Stopped on 21/10/1961 |
||
29/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1962. Dep: 27/02/1962. Stopped on 18/01/1962 |
||
08/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1962. Dep: 06/06/1962. Stopped on 02/05/1962 |
||
17/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1962. Dep: 02/10/1962. Stopped on 13/09/1962 |
||
14/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1962. Dep: 22/11/1962. Stopped on 07/11/1962 |
||
02/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1963. Dep: 06/04/1963. Stopped on 02/04/1963 |
||
09/07/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 09/07/1964. Dep: 16/07/1964. Stopped on 09/07/1964 Work undertaken: Component change |
||
18/11/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 18/11/1966. Stopped on 04/09/1966 Work undertaken: Seen in ‘A’ shop |
||
30/09/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
31/12/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 604 | ||
08/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |