Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 464 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4976 Week
» 27482 Month
» 330672 Year
» 1552237 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) E6027 10/04/1966

Locomotive Specifics
Class 73
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 10/04/1966
Withdrawn 16/07/1972
Time in Service 6 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 02/1973
Cut At British Rail at Selhurst MPD
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 09/07/1967
75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 14/06/1968
   Withdrawn on 16/07/1972


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/04/1966 To Service To service as E6027
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
14/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
10/01/1972 Sightings While working the 12:24 Three Bridges - Chichester Class 8 Engineer's train, in conjunction with E6010, the train's brakes failed on the approach to Horsham station. The train ran into the back of the 12:02 Victoria - Portsmouth Harbour, consisting of 4-CIG 7362 and 4-BEP 7004. Considerable damage ensued but no-one lost their lives - the driver and secondman of E6027 taking shelter in the locomotives electrical compartment when they realised that a collision was inevitable.
On investigation, the brake cocks between the two locomotives had been switched off by the secondman at Three Bridges in trying to rectify a starting fault and he had forgotten to switch them back on, resulting in the driver having no control of the train brakes.
The MoT report can be seen here. - Condemned as a result.
   
16/07/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as E6027    
02/1973 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at Selhurst MPD    

prev prev