Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3507 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34157 Week
» 132802 Month
» 335466 Year
» 3362319 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
116 |
m/e |
01/1915 |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
30 |
|
01/08/1915 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6830 |
|
14/07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8192 |
|
01/09/1946 |
British Railways |
68192 |
|
06/11/1948 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Inverurie |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
HIRE |
|
S.M.D. Ltd., Longmorn, Elgin |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
EXHIRE |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1915 |
Diagram 92 boiler fitted (number 30) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61508/24, 62240/60/65, 64466/71, 64500, 4531, 5229, 65279, 68192, ex-L.M.S. 44254, 4324, 15136, 17251, 17359, 17450/51. |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 116 Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 1858 Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) Diagram 92 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/08/1915 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30 |
|
|
1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1923. Dep: 22/11/1923. |
|
|
1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: ?/1925. Dep: 14/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6830
|
|
|
12/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: ?/12/1928. Dep: ?/01/1929. |
|
|
05/04/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934. |
|
|
18/04/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/04/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942. |
|
|
25/11/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. |
|
|
01/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8192 |
|
|
27/09/1948 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 68192
|
|
|
09/04/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1951. Dep: 27/04/1951. |
|
|
07/04/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 15/05/1953. |
|
|
18/04/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/04/1955. Dep: 27/04/1955. |
|
|
03/09/1955 |
To Store |
To Store at Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
24/09/1955 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
01/10/1955 |
To Store |
To Store at Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
28/04/1956 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
20/07/1959 |
To Store |
To Store at Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
28/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68192 from Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|