Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2903 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28937 Week
» 127582 Month
» 330246 Year
» 3357099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
310 |
m/e |
07/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 2nd) |
9310 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8121 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68121 |
on |
09/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y9 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 85 (Round Top firebox) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 01/07/1955 |
Service Life |
56 yrs , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1899 |
KPS |
|
Kipps |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/07/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
HIRE |
|
Bairds & Scottish Steel, Gartsherrie. |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
EXHIRE |
65E |
Kipps |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/07/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1920 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
01/1920 |
Reboilered |
01/1931 |
Cabsides fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 310 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
01/1920 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
01/1920 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9310 |
|
|
01/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Cabsides fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8121 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
09/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68121 |
|
|
01/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68121 |
|
|