Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3129 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33779 Week
» 132424 Month
» 335088 Year
» 3361941 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
144 |
m/e |
12/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 2nd) |
9144 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8118 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68118 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y9 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 85 (Round Top firebox) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/10/1958 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
EXLOAN |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
65G |
Yoker |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
19/02/1955 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
w/e |
31/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/10/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1923 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1923 |
Reboilered |
01/1933 |
Cabsides fitted |
07/1944 |
Makeshift tender (an ex-wagon) semi-permanently attached |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 144 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
03/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
03/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9144 |
|
|
01/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Cabsides fitted |
|
|
07/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Makeshift tender (an ex-wagon) semi-permanently attached |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8118 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68118 |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yoker (65G) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
24/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68118 |
|
|