Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4035 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30069 Week
» 128714 Month
» 331378 Year
» 3358231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
17 |
m/e |
12/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 2nd) |
9017 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8108 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68108 |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y9 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 85 (Round Top firebox) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 05/11/1959 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
06/08/1955 |
HIRE |
|
Inveresk Paper Co., Musselburgh |
4w/e |
06/08/1955 |
ALLOC |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
4w/e |
01/10/1955 |
EXHIRE |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
01/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1917 |
Reboilered |
05/1933 |
Cabsides fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1890 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 17 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
05/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9017 |
|
|
05/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Cabsides fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8108 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68108 |
|
|
06/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
01/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
21/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
05/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68108 |
|
|