Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 2431 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33081 Week
» 131726 Month
» 334390 Year
» 3361243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
310 |
m/e |
1887 |
North British Railway (2nd) |
900 |
m/e |
07/1899 |
North British Railway (3rd) |
1100 |
y/e |
1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 1st) |
9940 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 2nd) |
10100 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8098 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68098 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y9 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 85 (Round Top firebox) |
|
To Service |
During 1887 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 30/12/1954 |
Service Life |
68 yrs , 1 mth |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
1887 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
LOAN |
|
(NCB, Carberry) |
5w/e |
19/05/1951 |
64A |
|
St Margarets |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
64E |
|
Polmont |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/12/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
HIRE |
|
Scottish Agricultural Industries Ltd., Leith |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
EXHIRE |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
HIRE |
|
B. and S.S., Loanhead |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
64E |
Polmont |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/12/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1915 |
Reboilered |
12/1932 |
Cabsides fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1887 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 310 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
07/1899 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 900 |
|
|
1901 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1100 |
|
|
02/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 9940 but not taken up |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10100 |
|
|
12/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Cabsides fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8098 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68098 |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (64E) |
|
|
30/12/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68098 |
|
|