Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 60 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30710 Week
» 129355 Month
» 332019 Year
» 3358872 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
146 |
m/e |
1887 |
North British Railway (2nd) |
898 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
North British Railway (3rd) |
1098 |
y/e |
1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 1st) |
9939 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 2nd) |
10098 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8097 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68097 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y9 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 85 (Round Top firebox) |
|
To Service |
During 1887 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 14/10/1958 |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
1887 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/10/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1913 |
Reboilered |
02/1932 |
Cabsides fitted |
08/1951 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/05/1947 |
St Margarets MPD |
An unusual collection of locos. was observed at the old round-house on 10/5, comprising five ex N.B.R. 'Y9,' Nos. 8093, 8097, 8099, 8101, 8122 (all of which were remarkably clean), two ex G.E.R. 'J.69' Nos. 8562 and 8568, and one ex G.E.R. 'F7,' No. 7093. The latter having since been seen at Eastfield on 1/6, awaiting shop repairs. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 Nos. 77078, 77206, 77419 and 77494 were also on shed. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1887 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 146 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
06/1899 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 898 |
|
|
1901 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1098 |
|
|
12/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 9939 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10098 |
|
|
02/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Cabsides fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8097 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68097 |
|
|
08/1951 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68097 |
|
|