Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 811 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31461 Week
» 130106 Month
» 332770 Year
» 3359623 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
32 |
m/e |
1887 |
North British Railway (2nd) |
892 |
m/e |
11/1897 |
North British Railway (3rd) |
1092 |
y/e |
1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 1st) |
9933 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 2nd) |
10092 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8094 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68094 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y9 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 85 (Round Top firebox) |
|
To Service |
During 1887 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Tue 12/04/1955 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
1887 |
KPS |
|
Kipps |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/04/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KPS |
Kipps |
w/e |
25/10/1947 |
LOAN |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
on |
02/07/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/04/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1916 |
Reboilered |
11/1929 |
Cabsides fitted |
08/1935 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1887 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 32 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
11/1897 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 892 |
|
|
1901 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1092 |
|
|
09/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 9933 but not taken up |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10092 |
|
|
11/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Cabsides fitted |
|
|
08/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8094 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68094 |
|
|
12/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68094 |
|
|