Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2447 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33097 Week
» 131742 Month
» 334406 Year
» 3361259 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
547 |
m/e |
1882 |
North British Railway (2nd) |
902 |
m/e |
07/1899 |
North British Railway (3rd) |
1102 |
y/e |
1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 1st) |
9942 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 2nd) |
10102 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8093 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
68093 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y9 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
549 |
Works Number |
2936 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 85 (Round Top firebox) |
|
To Service |
During 1882 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 08/01/1958 |
Service Life |
76 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
1882 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/01/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/05/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1913 |
Reboilered |
08/1931 |
Cabsides fitted |
05/1948 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/05/1947 |
St Margarets MPD |
An unusual collection of locos. was observed at the old round-house on 10/5, comprising five ex N.B.R. 'Y9,' Nos. 8093, 8097, 8099, 8101, 8122 (all of which were remarkably clean), two ex G.E.R. 'J.69' Nos. 8562 and 8568, and one ex G.E.R. 'F7,' No. 7093. The latter having since been seen at Eastfield on 1/6, awaiting shop repairs. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 Nos. 77078, 77206, 77419 and 77494 were also on shed. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1882 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 547 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 2936 |
|
|
07/1899 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 902 |
|
|
1901 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1102 |
|
|
12/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9942 |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10102 |
|
|
08/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Cabsides fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8093 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68093 |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68093 |
|
|