Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 734 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5928 Week
» 12979 Month
» 235380 Year
» 1119761 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MSLR (1st) 512 m/e 03/1883
MSLR (2nd) 63 m/e 11/1893
GCR (Duplicate) 63B y/e 1909
GCR (Capital) 278 m/e 01/1911
GCR (Duplicate Again) 63B m/e 12/1911
LNER (1924) 6431   by 05/04/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Class Y2
Company History MSLR/LNER
Wheels 0-4-0ST
Builder Manning, Wardle & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 884
To Service During 03/1883 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Wed 08/07/1931 off Immingham (IMM)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 48 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) m/e 03/1883
   Withdrawn 08/07/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/05/1916 Diagram Not Issued boiler fitted (number 1136)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/04/1916 27/05/1916 57 days General
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram Not Issued)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1923 11/08/1923 57 days General  
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 21/07/1928 29 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1883 To Service To service as MSLR Number 512
Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 884
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
   
11/1893 Renumbered Renumbered to 63    
1909 Renumbered Renumbered to 63B    
01/1911 Renumbered Renumbered to 278    
12/1911 Renumbered Renumbered to 63B    
01/04/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1916. Dep: 27/05/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram Not Issued)
   
20/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - (Heavy) - Arr: 20/10/1920. Dep: 20/12/1920.    
16/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923.    
05/04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6431    
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 21/07/1928.    
08/07/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 6431 from Immingham (IMM)    

prev