Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1241 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14647 Week
» 67663 Month
» 187190 Year
» 3214043 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway (1st) |
512 |
m/e |
03/1883 |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway (2nd) |
63 |
m/e |
11/1893 |
Great Central Railway (Duplicate) |
63B |
y/e |
1909 |
Great Central Railway (Capital) |
278 |
m/e |
01/1911 |
Great Central Railway (Duplicate Again) |
63B |
m/e |
12/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6430 |
|
by 05/04/1926 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
27/05/1916 |
Diagram Not Issued boiler fitted (number 1136) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Gorton Works |
|
01/04/1916 |
27/05/1916 |
57 days |
General |
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram Not Issued)
|
|
|
|
20/10/1920 |
20/12/1920 |
62 days |
Heavy |
|
|
Gorton Works |
|
16/06/1923 |
11/08/1923 |
57 days |
General |
|
|
Gorton Works |
|
23/06/1928 |
21/07/1928 |
29 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 512 Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 884 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
11/1893 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63 |
|
|
1909 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63B |
|
|
01/1911 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 278 |
|
|
12/1911 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63B |
|
|
01/04/1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1916. Dep: 27/05/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1136 (Diagram Not Issued)
|
|
|
16/06/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923. |
|
|
05/04/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6430 |
|
|
23/06/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 21/07/1928. |
|
|
08/07/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6430 from Immingham (IMM) |
|
|