|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/10/1912 | 09/11/1912 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 713 (Diagram Not Issued) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1920 | 22/10/1921 | 505 days | General | Boiler number 146 (Diagram Not Issued) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1926 | 12/06/1926 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6431 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1929 | 27/07/1929 | 29 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1883 | To Service | To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 511 Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 885 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) |
||
11/1893 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62 | ||
1909 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62B | ||
12/10/1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1912. Dep: 09/11/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 713 (Diagram Not Issued) |
||
05/06/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1920. Dep: 22/10/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 146 (Diagram Not Issued) |
||
17/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1926. Dep: 12/06/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6431 |
||
29/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929. | ||
08/07/1931 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6431 from Immingham (IMM) |