Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 589 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 3955 Week
» 589 Month
» 337435 Year
» 1559000 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) E6024 03/1966
TOPS (Tops) 73118 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/05/1987 The Romney Hythe and Dymchurch Railway

Locomotive Specifics
Class 73
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 03/1966
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 09/07/1967
75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 14/06/1968


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1966 To Service To service as E6024
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
14/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 73118    
08/05/1987 Naming Named 'The Romney Hythe and Dymchurch Railway' by Brian Johnstone OBE (BBC circket commentator) at Folkestone Harbour station    

prev prev