25/02/1941 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3401, name: BANTAM COCK Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1919 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Tender fitted: LNER 3,500g Group Standard Diagram 112 boiler fitted |
|
|
19/04/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
05/05/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) |
|
|
08/06/1941 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
15/06/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) |
|
|
21/06/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
28/11/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
24/02/1942 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) |
|
|
11/11/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1942. Dep: 18/11/1942. |
|
|
01/12/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942. |
|
|
27/02/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 05/03/1943. |
|
|
23/10/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
22/07/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944. |
|
|
09/12/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1944. Dep: 15/12/1944. |
|
|
27/01/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 27/01/1945. Work undertaken: Snowplough fitted
|
|
|
14/04/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. |
|
|
22/09/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945. |
|
|
17/11/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. |
|
|
01/12/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. |
|
|
21/02/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. |
|
|
08/05/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1946. Dep: 08/05/1946. |
|
|
06/1946 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LNER 3,500g Group Standard number 5725 |
|
|
26/06/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946. |
|
|
14/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1700 |
|
|
05/10/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. |
|
|
02/08/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1947. Dep: 05/08/1947. |
|
|
15/11/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947. |
|
|
23/02/1948 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1948. Dep: 26/02/1948. |
|
|
13/10/1948 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948. |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61700 |
|
|
04/01/1949 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949. |
|
|
14/03/1949 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1949. Dep: 17/03/1949. |
|
|
05/07/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/07/1950. Dep: 12/07/1950. |
|
|
30/08/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1950. Dep: 08/09/1950. |
|
|
02/11/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/11/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950. |
|
|
22/03/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/03/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951. |
|
|
21/05/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/05/1951. Dep: 23/05/1951. |
|
|
03/01/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/01/1952. Dep: 09/02/1952. |
|
|
25/02/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1952. Dep: 26/02/1952. |
|
|
28/05/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1952. Dep: 06/06/1952. |
|
|
14/11/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. |
|
|
10/06/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/06/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. |
|
|
18/08/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1953. Dep: 26/11/1953. |
|
|
30/11/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1953. Dep: 17/12/1953. |
|
|
09/02/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954. |
|
|
24/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
23/08/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955. |
|
|
14/09/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. |
|
|
11/04/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/04/1956. Dep: 01/05/1956. |
|
|
28/01/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/01/1957. Dep: 28/01/1957. |
|
|
14/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61700 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|