|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/01/1944 | 19/01/1944 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1944 | 23/11/1944 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 127 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1949 | 26/11/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60978 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1951 | 28/11/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29455 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1956 | 08/02/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29491 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1956 | 27/02/1956 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1956 | 21/03/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1957 | 14/08/1957 | 42 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1958 | 30/06/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29414 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1959 | 05/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1960 | 15/09/1960 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28061 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1962 | 04/04/1962 | 3 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3690 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1921 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
07/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1944. Dep: 19/01/1944. | ||
25/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1944. Dep: 23/11/1944. | ||
24/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 878 but not taken up | ||
04/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 978 | ||
03/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. | ||
18/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60978 |
||
30/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 28/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29455 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1956. Dep: 08/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29491 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1956. Dep: 27/02/1956. | ||
19/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 21/03/1956. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
04/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/07/1957. Dep: 14/08/1957. | ||
28/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1958. Dep: 30/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29414 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
03/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1959. Dep: 05/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
05/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1960. Dep: 15/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28061 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1962. Dep: 04/04/1962. | ||
19/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60978 from Heaton (52B) | ||
24/05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |